THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 09:34:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137378444
Fax: 6137388332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avelino De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Avelino (CPSO#: 101228 ) Dr. A. De Jesus (CPSO#: 104983 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew Ontario K7V 0C3
(613) 432-2222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137378444
Fax: 6137388332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Mar 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avelino De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Avelino (CPSO#: 101228 ) Dr. A. De Jesus (CPSO#: 104983 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew Ontario K7V 0C3
(613) 432-2222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY RAYMOND DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY RAYMOND DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014