THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 20:35:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manwani (CPSO#: 101517 ) Dr. S. Chopra (CPSO#: 89052 )
Business Address: Civic Heart Centre
Suite 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manwani (CPSO#: 101517 ) Dr. S. Chopra (CPSO#: 89052 )
Business Address: Civic Heart Centre
Suite 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEETU KISHAN MANWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEETU KISHAN MANWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013