THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Civic Heart Centre
10 Cottrelle Blvd, Unit 205
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-497-7747
Fax: 905-497-7748
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 497-7748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manwani (CPSO#: 101517 ) Dr. S. Chopra (CPSO#: 89052 )
Business Address: Civic Heart Centre
Suite 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Civic Heart Centre
10 Cottrelle Blvd, Unit 205
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-497-7747
Fax: 905-497-7748
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 497-7748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manwani (CPSO#: 101517 ) Dr. S. Chopra (CPSO#: 89052 )
Business Address: Civic Heart Centre
Suite 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SUNNY CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SUNNY CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008