THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:41:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagappa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagappa (CPSO#: 101909 ) Dr. Y. Subramani (CPSO#: 105289 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 850-5598

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL
Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagappa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagappa (CPSO#: 101909 ) Dr. Y. Subramani (CPSO#: 105289 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 850-5598

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAHESH NAGAPPA may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAHESH NAGAPPA may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2013