THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:54:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4199024715
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagappa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagappa (CPSO#: 101909 ) Dr. Y. Subramani (CPSO#: 105289 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 850-5598

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, TAMIL
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4199024715
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagappa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagappa (CPSO#: 101909 ) Dr. Y. Subramani (CPSO#: 105289 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 850-5598

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YAMINI SUBRAMANI may practise medicine independently in Anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YAMINI SUBRAMANI may practise medicine independently in Anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2015