THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:57:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 0B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-1133
Fax: (519) 752-9806
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519)752-7871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519)426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruen (CPSO#: 102010 ) Dr. S. Yazdanian (CPSO#: 84759 )
Business Address: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 752-1133
Business Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-2323
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
460 Rymal Rd W
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
(905) 318-0384

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 0B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-1133
Fax: (519) 752-9806
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519)752-7871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519)426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruen (CPSO#: 102010 ) Dr. S. Yazdanian (CPSO#: 84759 )
Business Address: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 752-1133
Business Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-2323
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
460 Rymal Rd W
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
(905) 318-0384

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN PATRICK JOHN BRUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN PATRICK JOHN BRUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2013