THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 06:59:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-185 Robinson Street
Norfolk Family Health Team
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 5L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
Satellite Clinic
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Address: 460 Rymal Rd W
Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
Phone: (905) 318-0384
Fax: (905) 381-6531
Address: 255 Governors Road
Chartwell Georgian Retirement Residence
Hamilton Ontario L9H 3K4
Phone: 905-627-8444
Fax: (905) 627-9820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruen (CPSO#: 102010 ) Dr. S. Yazdanian (CPSO#: 84759 )
Business Address: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 752-1133
Business Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-2323
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
460 Rymal Rd W
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
(905) 318-0384

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-185 Robinson Street
Norfolk Family Health Team
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 5L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
Satellite Clinic
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Address: 460 Rymal Rd W
Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
Phone: (905) 318-0384
Fax: (905) 381-6531
Address: 255 Governors Road
Chartwell Georgian Retirement Residence
Hamilton Ontario L9H 3K4
Phone: 905-627-8444
Fax: (905) 627-9820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruen (CPSO#: 102010 ) Dr. S. Yazdanian (CPSO#: 84759 )
Business Address: Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 5L8
(519) 752-1133
Business Address: Norfolk Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-2323
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5858
Business Address: Chartwell Deerview Crossing Retirement Residence
460 Rymal Rd W
Hamilton ON L9B 0B2
(905) 318-0384

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN OLGA YAZDANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN OLGA YAZDANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006