THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:43:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilic (CPSO#: 82919 ) Dr. A. Blagojevic (CPSO#: 102125 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilic (CPSO#: 82919 ) Dr. A. Blagojevic (CPSO#: 102125 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA BLAGOJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAGOJEVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA BLAGOJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAGOJEVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013