THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 08:44:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King St
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2541
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilic (CPSO#: 82919 ) Dr. A. Blagojevic (CPSO#: 102125 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King St
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2541
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilic (CPSO#: 82919 ) Dr. A. Blagojevic (CPSO#: 102125 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FILIP GILIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FILIP GILIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005