THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 University Ave W
University of Waterloo Student Health Services
Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 888-4096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walus (CPSO#: 102146 ) Dr. A. Walus (CPSO#: 111019 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 University Ave W
University of Waterloo Student Health Services
Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 888-4096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walus (CPSO#: 102146 ) Dr. A. Walus (CPSO#: 111019 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATARZYNA ANNA WALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATARZYNA ANNA WALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013