THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:21:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: 5197424657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walus (CPSO#: 102146 ) Dr. A. Walus (CPSO#: 111019 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: 5197424657

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walus (CPSO#: 102146 ) Dr. A. Walus (CPSO#: 111019 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ KLAUDIUSZ WALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ KLAUDIUSZ WALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016