THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:32:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Family Health Team
245 Dixon Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 775-8244
Fax: (647) 775-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sreetharan and Bide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bide (CPSO#: 102266 ) Dr. S. Sreetharan (CPSO#: 102154 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Family Health Team
245 Dixon Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 775-8244
Fax: (647) 775-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sreetharan and Bide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bide (CPSO#: 102266 ) Dr. S. Sreetharan (CPSO#: 102154 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sreelavaniya Sreetharan may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sreelavaniya Sreetharan may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013