THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River FHT
245 Dixon Road
106
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 775-8282
Fax: (647) 775-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sreetharan and Bide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bide (CPSO#: 102266 ) Dr. S. Sreetharan (CPSO#: 102154 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River FHT
245 Dixon Road
106
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 775-8282
Fax: (647) 775-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sreetharan and Bide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bide (CPSO#: 102266 ) Dr. S. Sreetharan (CPSO#: 102154 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 05 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pralhad Shankar Bide may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pralhad Shankar Bide may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2013