THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:49:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Division of Hematology
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 56072
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foster (CPSO#: 102195 ) Dr. L. Saini (CPSO#: 81297 )
Business Address: E6-218
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58479

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Division of Hematology
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 56072
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foster (CPSO#: 102195 ) Dr. L. Saini (CPSO#: 81297 )
Business Address: E6-218
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58479

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2013