THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road E.
Room E6-218
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foster (CPSO#: 102195 ) Dr. L. Saini (CPSO#: 81297 )
Business Address: E6-218
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58479

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road E.
Room E6-218
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Foster (CPSO#: 102195 ) Dr. L. Saini (CPSO#: 81297 )
Business Address: E6-218
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58479

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LALIT KUMAR SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LALIT KUMAR SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004