THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:38:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Apr 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ojha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ojha (CPSO#: 102774 ) Dr. S. Ojha (CPSO#: 108061 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
B1-139
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8814

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Apr 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ojha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ojha (CPSO#: 102774 ) Dr. S. Ojha (CPSO#: 108061 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
B1-139
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8814

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 15 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAHUL OJHA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAHUL OJHA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2014