THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Psychiatry
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Mar 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ojha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ojha (CPSO#: 102774 ) Dr. S. Ojha (CPSO#: 108061 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
B1-139
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8814

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Psychiatry
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Mar 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ojha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ojha (CPSO#: 102774 ) Dr. S. Ojha (CPSO#: 108061 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
B1-139
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8814

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 15 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SUJATA OJHA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SUJATA OJHA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015