THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:04:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KONKANI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Adult Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Fax: 416-323-6176
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Rheumatology Clinic
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-6016
Fax: 705-360-6004
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-323-6344
Fax: 416-323-6115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Koppikar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koppikar (CPSO#: 103051 ) Dr. P. Patel (CPSO#: 115667 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KONKANI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Adult Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Fax: 416-323-6176
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Rheumatology Clinic
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-6016
Fax: 705-360-6004
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-323-6344
Fax: 416-323-6115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Koppikar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koppikar (CPSO#: 103051 ) Dr. P. Patel (CPSO#: 115667 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHIL KOPPIKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPIKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHIL KOPPIKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPIKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014