THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-451-6959
Fax: 905-451-0458
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: 905- 494-6416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Koppikar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koppikar (CPSO#: 103051 ) Dr. P. Patel (CPSO#: 115667 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-451-6959
Fax: 905-451-0458
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: 905- 494-6416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Koppikar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koppikar (CPSO#: 103051 ) Dr. P. Patel (CPSO#: 115667 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018