THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold
Ontario
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905 687-1855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dion (CPSO#: 92894 ) Dr. A. Blanchard (CPSO#: 103660 )
Business Address: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
St Catharines Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold
Ontario
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905 687-1855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dion (CPSO#: 92894 ) Dr. A. Blanchard (CPSO#: 103660 )
Business Address: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
St Catharines Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRAE BLANCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRAE BLANCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014