THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-641-5556
Fax: 905-641-7515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dion (CPSO#: 92894 ) Dr. A. Blanchard (CPSO#: 103660 )
Business Address: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
St Catharines Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-641-5556
Fax: 905-641-7515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dion (CPSO#: 92894 ) Dr. A. Blanchard (CPSO#: 103660 )
Business Address: Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
St Catharines Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE SUSANNE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE SUSANNE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010