THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: D718 Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Sunnybrook Hoss Tilley Burn Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4806100
Extension: 3769
Fax: (416) 480-4531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 28 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 ) Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 104310 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3769

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: D718 Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Sunnybrook Hoss Tilley Burn Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4806100
Extension: 3769
Fax: (416) 480-4531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 28 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 ) Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 104310 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3769

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 28 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALAN DAVID ROGERS may practise medicine independently in Plastic Surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALAN DAVID ROGERS may practise medicine independently in Plastic Surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014