THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:39:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
David Braley Research Institute
C5-104
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Jeschke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
David Braley Research Institute
C5-104
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 ) Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 104310 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3769

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
David Braley Research Institute
C5-104
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Jeschke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
David Braley Research Institute
C5-104
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke (CPSO#: 92713 ) Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 104310 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3769

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jul 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 15 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARC GERHARD JESCHKE may practise medicine independently in plastic surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARC GERHARD JESCHKE may practise medicine independently in plastic surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 May 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2010