THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:08:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ruttenstock, Elke Maria (Used Until: 30 Nov 2017)
Medical School: University of Graz, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd W
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augusto Zani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zani (CPSO#: 104505 ) Dr. E. Zani-Ruttenstock (CPSO#: 104974 )

General Information

Former Name: Ruttenstock, Elke Maria (Used Until: 30 Nov 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Graz, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd W
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augusto Zani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zani (CPSO#: 104505 ) Dr. E. Zani-Ruttenstock (CPSO#: 104974 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELKE MARIA ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELKE MARIA ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Graz, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
Western University
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
24 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 24 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014