THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-5831
Fax: (519) 271-5930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irvine & Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Irvine (CPSO#: 105296 ) Dr. C. Ly (CPSO#: 107957 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
519-271-7172,

Corporation Name: Dr. Curtis Irvine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-5831
Fax: (519) 271-5930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irvine & Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Irvine (CPSO#: 105296 ) Dr. C. Ly (CPSO#: 107957 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
519-271-7172,

Corporation Name: Dr. Curtis Irvine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS DETLOR IRVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRVINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS DETLOR IRVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRVINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015