THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192717172
Fax: 5192716760
Address: 444 Duoro St
Stratford Ontario N5A0E6
Phone: 519-271-2061
Fax: 519-271-8255
Address: 75 University Ave. West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C5
Phone: 519-884-0710
Extension: 3146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irvine & Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Irvine (CPSO#: 105296 ) Dr. C. Ly (CPSO#: 107957 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
519-271-7172,

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192717172
Fax: 5192716760
Address: 444 Duoro St
Stratford Ontario N5A0E6
Phone: 519-271-2061
Fax: 519-271-8255
Address: 75 University Ave. West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C5
Phone: 519-884-0710
Extension: 3146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irvine & Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Irvine (CPSO#: 105296 ) Dr. C. Ly (CPSO#: 107957 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
519-271-7172,

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Ly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015