THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:06:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 825-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 905 632 3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jan 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Qadura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qadura (CPSO#: 95508 ) Dr. R. Abdin (CPSO#: 105756 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 825-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 905 632 3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jan 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Qadura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qadura (CPSO#: 95508 ) Dr. R. Abdin (CPSO#: 105756 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAND MOWAFFAQ ABDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAND MOWAFFAQ ABDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015