THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 09:46:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street, 7-076 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5154
Fax: 416-864-6012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Qadura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qadura (CPSO#: 95508 ) Dr. R. Abdin (CPSO#: 105756 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street, 7-076 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5154
Fax: 416-864-6012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Qadura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qadura (CPSO#: 95508 ) Dr. R. Abdin (CPSO#: 105756 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD QADURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADURA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD QADURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADURA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011