THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:37:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
South Georgian Bay Community Health Centre
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 422 1888
Fax: 705 422 1078

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westerink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westerink (CPSO#: 106058 ) Dr. J. Westerink (CPSO#: 115755 )
Business Address: Rizzardo Health and Wellness Centre
2300 - 7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
(705) 436-2251
Business Address: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
South Georgian Bay Community Health Centre
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 422 1888
Fax: 705 422 1078

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westerink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westerink (CPSO#: 106058 ) Dr. J. Westerink (CPSO#: 115755 )
Business Address: Rizzardo Health and Wellness Centre
2300 - 7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
(705) 436-2251
Business Address: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN WESTERINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTERINK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN WESTERINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTERINK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015