THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 22:27:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital - FMTU
201 Georgian Drive
c/o 3rd Floor Rotary Place
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westerink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westerink (CPSO#: 106058 ) Dr. J. Westerink (CPSO#: 115755 )
Business Address: Rizzardo Health and Wellness Centre
2300 - 7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
(705) 436-2251
Business Address: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital - FMTU
201 Georgian Drive
c/o 3rd Floor Rotary Place
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westerink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westerink (CPSO#: 106058 ) Dr. J. Westerink (CPSO#: 115755 )
Business Address: Rizzardo Health and Wellness Centre
2300 - 7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
(705) 436-2251
Business Address: 202-14 Ramblewood Dr
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTINA ELIZABETH YVETTE WESTERINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTERINK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTINA ELIZABETH YVETTE WESTERINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTERINK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018