THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:18:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health, Richmond Hill Hospital
Infectious Diseases
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-2064
Fax: 905-883-2065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU AND FEAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Fear (CPSO#: 106170 ) Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 114834 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
905-883-2064

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health, Richmond Hill Hospital
Infectious Diseases
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-2064
Fax: 905-883-2065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU AND FEAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Fear (CPSO#: 106170 ) Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 114834 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
905-883-2064

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS VERNON FREDERICK FEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS VERNON FREDERICK FEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015