THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 18:06:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: M5G 2C4
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU AND FEAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Fear (CPSO#: 106170 ) Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 114834 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
905-883-2064

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: M5G 2C4
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU AND FEAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Fear (CPSO#: 106170 ) Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 114834 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
905-883-2064

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE JIA LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE JIA LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018