THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 07:59:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care
11 King St. W C-120
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-9990
Fax: (416) 368-9992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Presvelos Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Presvelos (CPSO#: 106707 ) Dr. R. Colibasanu (CPSO#: 107101 )
Business Address: 11 King St W
C-120
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
416-368-9990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care
11 King St. W C-120
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-9990
Fax: (416) 368-9992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Presvelos Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Presvelos (CPSO#: 106707 ) Dr. R. Colibasanu (CPSO#: 107101 )
Business Address: 11 King St W
C-120
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
416-368-9990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CONSTANTIN PRESVELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRESVELOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CONSTANTIN PRESVELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRESVELOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015