THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:59:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Presvelos Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Presvelos (CPSO#: 106707 ) Dr. R. Colibasanu (CPSO#: 107101 )
Business Address: 11 King St W
C-120
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
416-368-9990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Presvelos Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Presvelos (CPSO#: 106707 ) Dr. R. Colibasanu (CPSO#: 107101 )
Business Address: 11 King St W
C-120
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
416-368-9990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUXANDRA CATRINEL COLIBASANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLIBASANU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUXANDRA CATRINEL COLIBASANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLIBASANU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015