THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. X LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Liu (CPSO#: 107104 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4

Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaberi (CPSO#: 93073 ) Dr. X. Liu (CPSO#: 107104 ) Dr. R. Bhayana (CPSO#: 103638 ) Dr. M. Lax (CPSO#: 68111 ) Dr. K. Tan (CPSO#: 79902 ) Dr. E. Bartlett (CPSO#: 79820 ) Dr. H. Schmidt (CPSO#: 77345 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800
Business Address: Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. X LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Liu (CPSO#: 107104 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4

Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaberi (CPSO#: 93073 ) Dr. X. Liu (CPSO#: 107104 ) Dr. R. Bhayana (CPSO#: 103638 ) Dr. M. Lax (CPSO#: 68111 ) Dr. K. Tan (CPSO#: 79902 ) Dr. E. Bartlett (CPSO#: 79820 ) Dr. H. Schmidt (CPSO#: 77345 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800
Business Address: Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAOYANG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAOYANG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015