THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dibrugarh University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1PMB -283
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3385
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Medical Imaging
14 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Dec 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sangeet Ghai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghai (CPSO#: 78106 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1PMB-283
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 3385

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Dibrugarh University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1PMB -283
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3385
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Medical Imaging
14 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Dec 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sangeet Ghai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghai (CPSO#: 78106 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1PMB-283
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 3385

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Mar 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 28 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sangeet Ghai may practise medicine independently in diagnostic and
interventional radiology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sangeet Ghai may practise medicine independently in diagnostic and
interventional radiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dibrugarh University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002