THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon Street
Tower C - C102
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2164
Fax: 613-732-2158
Address: Pembroke General Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew Ontario K7V1P6
Phone: 6134324851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DE JESUS LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Legare-Archambault (CPSO#: 110031 ) Dr. C. de Jesus (CPSO#: 107237 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
613-732-2811

Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Deacon Street
Tower C - C102
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2164
Fax: 613-732-2158
Address: Pembroke General Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew Ontario K7V1P6
Phone: 6134324851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DE JESUS LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Legare-Archambault (CPSO#: 110031 ) Dr. C. de Jesus (CPSO#: 107237 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
613-732-2811

Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FILEMON DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FILEMON DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015