THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:22:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Drive
Deep River and District Hospital
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Phone: (613) 584-3333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DE JESUS LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Legare-Archambault (CPSO#: 110031 ) Dr. C. de Jesus (CPSO#: 107237 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
613-732-2811

Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Drive
Deep River and District Hospital
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Phone: (613) 584-3333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DE JESUS LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Legare-Archambault (CPSO#: 110031 ) Dr. C. de Jesus (CPSO#: 107237 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
613-732-2811

Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMELINE FABIOLA LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMELINE FABIOLA LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGARE-ARCHAMBAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2024
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016