THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 17:53:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehab University Centre
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Feb 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANKITA MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 ) Dr. N. Ankita (CPSO#: 131775 )
Business Address: 402-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
4166219700
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
905-625-1241

Corporation Name: Nimish Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Rehab University Centre
Room 7-131
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 7A2
(416) 597-3422
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C2
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehab University Centre
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Feb 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANKITA MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 ) Dr. N. Ankita (CPSO#: 131775 )
Business Address: 402-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
4166219700
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
905-625-1241

Corporation Name: Nimish Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Rehab University Centre
Room 7-131
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 7A2
(416) 597-3422
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C2
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NIMISH MITTAL may practise medicine independently in Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation and Adult Chronic Pain Management.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NIMISH MITTAL may practise medicine independently in Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation and Adult Chronic Pain Management.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jan 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jan 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2015