THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lokmanya Tilak Municipal Medical College, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056251241
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANKITA MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 ) Dr. N. Ankita (CPSO#: 131775 )
Business Address: 402-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
4166219700
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
905-625-1241

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lokmanya Tilak Municipal Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056251241
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANKITA MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mittal (CPSO#: 107937 ) Dr. N. Ankita (CPSO#: 131775 )
Business Address: 402-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
4166219700
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
905-625-1241

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. N-A ANKITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANKITA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. N-A ANKITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANKITA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lokmanya Tilak Municipal Medical College, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021