THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 17:53:57 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouollette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette. Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 9734401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 9852606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ayodeji Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 108481 ) Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(902) 577-5510
Business Address: Leamington District Hospital
194 Talbot West
Leamington Ontario N5H 1N9
(519) 300-1255
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(902) 577-5510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouollette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette. Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 9734401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 9852606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ayodeji Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 108481 ) Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(902) 577-5510
Business Address: Leamington District Hospital
194 Talbot West
Leamington Ontario N5H 1N9
(519) 300-1255
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(902) 577-5510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYODEJI OLUGBENGA AKINLAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYODEJI OLUGBENGA AKINLAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2016