THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maryvale Adolescent & Family
Services
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario M9C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maryvale Adolescent and
Family Services
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Regional Children's Centre
3901 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
Phone: 5192575215
Extension: 74080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ayodeji Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 108481 ) Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(902) 577-5510
Business Address: Leamington District Hospital
194 Talbot West
Leamington Ontario N5H 1N9
(519) 300-1255
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(902) 577-5510

Corporation Name: Dr. Adeola Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: 3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
(519) 258-0484
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 390 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
(519) 257-5215

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maryvale Adolescent & Family
Services
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario M9C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maryvale Adolescent and
Family Services
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Regional Children's Centre
3901 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
Phone: 5192575215
Extension: 74080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ayodeji Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 108481 ) Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(902) 577-5510
Business Address: Leamington District Hospital
194 Talbot West
Leamington Ontario N5H 1N9
(519) 300-1255
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(902) 577-5510

Corporation Name: Dr. Adeola Akinlaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlaja (CPSO#: 110951 )
Business Address: 3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
(519) 258-0484
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 390 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
(519) 257-5215

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEOLA BUSOLA AKINLAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEOLA BUSOLA AKINLAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016