THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:35:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Mental Health
Care and Research
Department of Psychiatry
205A - 2121 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
CMAP Health
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
Phone: 1 8886916111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rocketdoctor.ca
Online Virtual Clinic
Toronto ON
Phone: 6476976973
Fax: 6139025147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moshieve Febin Edwin Sona Jasmine Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwin (CPSO#: 108701 ) Dr. S. Jasmine Das (CPSO#: 111045 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 205A-2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: CMAP Health
110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
(888) 691-6111
Business Address: The Royal Mental Health Care & Research
Community Mental Health Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Mental Health
Care and Research
Department of Psychiatry
205A - 2121 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
CMAP Health
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
Phone: 1 8886916111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rocketdoctor.ca
Online Virtual Clinic
Toronto ON
Phone: 6476976973
Fax: 6139025147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moshieve Febin Edwin Sona Jasmine Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwin (CPSO#: 108701 ) Dr. S. Jasmine Das (CPSO#: 111045 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 205A-2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: CMAP Health
110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
(888) 691-6111
Business Address: The Royal Mental Health Care & Research
Community Mental Health Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSHIEVE FEBIN EDWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSHIEVE FEBIN EDWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016