THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:27:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medical Sciences Pariyaram, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: 6136040277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moshieve Febin Edwin Sona Jasmine Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwin (CPSO#: 108701 ) Dr. S. Jasmine Das (CPSO#: 111045 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 205A-2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: CMAP Health
110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
(888) 691-6111
Business Address: The Royal Mental Health Care & Research
Community Mental Health Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Academy of Medical Sciences Pariyaram, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: 6136040277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moshieve Febin Edwin Sona Jasmine Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwin (CPSO#: 108701 ) Dr. S. Jasmine Das (CPSO#: 111045 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 205A-2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: CMAP Health
110-1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3N6
(888) 691-6111
Business Address: The Royal Mental Health Care & Research
Community Mental Health Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONA JASMINE DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASMINE DAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONA JASMINE DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASMINE DAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medical Sciences Pariyaram, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2016