THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:25:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Surgery
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5255
Fax: (416) 480-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW GUTTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Guttman (CPSO#: 109079 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Surgery
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Surgery
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5255
Fax: (416) 480-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW GUTTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Guttman (CPSO#: 109079 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Surgery
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW PAUL GUTTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTTMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW PAUL GUTTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTTMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016