THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5255
Fax: 416-480-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Haas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Haas (CPSO#: 84466 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H186 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Room H186
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5255
Fax: 416-480-5499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Haas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Haas (CPSO#: 84466 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H186 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA HAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA HAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006