THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:34:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-36 McDonald street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-645-2281
Fax: 705-645-0057

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1-36 McDonald St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2C2

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Whynot (CPSO#: 59620 ) Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1152 Bradley Road
Unit 2
Gravenhurst Ont P1P 1R2
5197026271

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-36 McDonald street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-645-2281
Fax: 705-645-0057

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1-36 McDonald St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2C2

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Whynot (CPSO#: 59620 ) Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1152 Bradley Road
Unit 2
Gravenhurst Ont P1P 1R2
5197026271

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MCKENZIE WHYNOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MCKENZIE WHYNOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016