THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 12:16:43 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1360
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 702-6271
Fax: (519) 439-2352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Whynot (CPSO#: 59620 ) Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1152 Bradley Road
Unit 2
Gravenhurst Ont P1P 1R2
5197026271

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1360
Gravenhurst Ontario P1P 1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 702-6271
Fax: (519) 439-2352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Whynot (CPSO#: 59620 ) Dr. S. Whynot (CPSO#: 109106 )
Business Address: 1152 Bradley Road
Unit 2
Gravenhurst Ont P1P 1R2
5197026271

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT WHYNOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT WHYNOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988