THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:44:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst St
Baycrest
Department of Medicine - Geriatric/Internal Medicine
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Extension: 2613
Fax: 416-785-2863
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Geriatric Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4076
Fax: (416) 480-4178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. XU AND C. WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 109289 ) Dr. V. Xu (CPSO#: 109116 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
1C24
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst St
Baycrest
Department of Medicine - Geriatric/Internal Medicine
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Extension: 2613
Fax: 416-785-2863
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Geriatric Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4076
Fax: (416) 480-4178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. XU AND C. WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 109289 ) Dr. V. Xu (CPSO#: 109116 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
1C24
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA YANG YANG JEAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA YANG YANG JEAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016