THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 14:09:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. XU AND C. WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 109289 ) Dr. V. Xu (CPSO#: 109116 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
1C24
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. XU AND C. WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 109289 ) Dr. V. Xu (CPSO#: 109116 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
1C24
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Unit 1-PMB-298
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENHAN DAVID WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENHAN DAVID WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016